Senate | 05/15/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/15/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2025 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 05/12/2025 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3838A | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.657 |