Assembly | 04/09/2025 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.531 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |