Assembly | 04/02/2025 | referred to judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.365 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | REFERRED TO CODES |