Assembly | 04/28/2025 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.398 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |