Senate | 04/22/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2025 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4574B | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.622 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | PRINT NUMBER 4574A | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |