Senate | 04/24/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2025 | referred to higher education | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4685A | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.457 |