LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S04879
Action History
NY
New York Senate Bill S04879
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2025-2026 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S04879
Action History
Senate
05/14/2025
AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4879B
Senate
05/08/2025
AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4879A
Senate
05/08/2025
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Senate
05/07/2025
2ND REPORT CAL.
Senate
05/06/2025
1ST REPORT CAL.944
Senate
02/13/2025
REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION