Assembly | 03/19/2025 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.378 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |