Assembly | 03/19/2025 | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.544 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS |