Assembly | 03/05/2025 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.413 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |