Assembly | 04/09/2025 | referred to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.514 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |