Assembly | 03/27/2025 | referred to economic development | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | 1ST REPORT CAL.553 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |