Senate | 03/24/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 6 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, McDugle, Rosecrants | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Bush |