Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Remains on Fourth Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Considered and deferred
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Measure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 28
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Conference granted, SCs named Garvin, Daniels, Paxton, Jech, Boren, Floyd
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Bush
|
|
|