Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1007 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 17, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021