House
|
04/20/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Returned to General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 72 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Roe
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 60
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Roe
|
|
|