Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1014 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 31, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 25, 2021