House
|
05/03/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Worthen
|
|
|