Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1024 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill February 26, 2021