Senate | 03/23/2021 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Remove as author Senator Coleman; authored by Senator Standridge | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Emergency removed | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Frix | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Luttrell |