House
|
05/04/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Bell
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Boles
|
|
|