Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1064 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2021

Amended

Bill April 5, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021