House
|
04/28/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Provenzano
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles, Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Hardin (Tommy)
|
|
|