Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1067 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2022

Amended

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022