Senate | 04/05/2021 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Referred to Administrative Rules | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Gann |