Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1079 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/06/2021

                             
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1079 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
April 5, 2021 
 
 
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 1079 	By: Gann and Crosswhite Hader 
of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Dahm of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to sunset; amending 59 O.S. 2011, 
Section 137, as last amended by Section 1, Chapter 
469, O.S.L. 2019 (59 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 137), 
which relates to the Board of Podiatric Medical 
Examiners; re-creating the Board; and modifying 
termination date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     59 O.S. 2011, Section 137, as last 
amended by Section 1, Chapter 469, O.S.L. 2019 (59 O.S. Supp. 2020, 
Section 137), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 137. A.  A Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners is 
hereby re-created, to continue until July 1, 2021 2024, in 
accordance with the provisions of the Oklahoma Sunset Law.  Said 
Board shall regulate the practice of podiatric medicine in this 
state in accordance with the provisions of the Podiatric Medicine 
Practice Act.  The Board, a ppointed by the Governor, shall be   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1079 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
composed of five podiatric physicians licensed to practice podiatric 
medicine in this state and one lay member representing the public. 
B.  Each podiatric physician member of the Board shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of th is state; 
2.  Have practiced podiatric medicine cont inuously in this state 
during the three (3) years immediately preceding his appointment to 
the Board; 
3.  Be free of pending disciplinary action or active 
investigation by the Board; and 
4.  Be a member in good standing of the American Podiatric 
Medical Association and of the Oklahoma Podiatric Medical 
Association. 
C.  The lay member of the Board shall: 
1.  Be a legal resident of this state; 
2.  Not be a registered or licensed practitioner of any of the 
healing arts or be related, within the third degree of consanguinity 
or affinity, to any such person; and 
3.  Participate in Board proceedings only for the purposes of: 
a. reviewing, investigating and disposing of written 
complaints regarding the conduct of podiatric 
physicians, and 
b. formulating, adopting a nd promulgating rules pursuant 
to Article I of the Administrative Procedures Act.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1079 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
D.  Except as provided in subsection E of this section, the term 
of office of each podiatric physician member of the Board shall be 
five (5) years, with one such member being appointed to the Board 
each year.  The lay member of the Board shall serve a term 
coterminous with that of the Governor.  Each member shall hold 
office until the expiration of the term for which appointe d or until 
a qualified successor has been duly appoi nted.  An appointment shall 
be made by the Governor within ninety (90) days after the expiration 
of the term of any member, or the occurrence of a vacancy on the 
Board due to resignation, death, or any ot her cause resulting in an 
unexpired term.  The appoi ntment of the podiatric physician members 
shall be made from a list of not less than five persons submitted 
annually to the Governor by the Oklahoma Podiatric Medical 
Association. 
E.  Each of the three po diatric physician members of the Board, 
serving on the effective date of this act, shall complete the term 
of office for which he or she was appointed, and the successor to 
each such member shall be appointed for a term of five (5) years.  
Within sixty (60) days after the effective date of this act, the 
Governor shall appoint two new podiatric physician members to the 
Board, one for a term expiring July 1, 1997, and one for a term 
expiring on July 1, 1998.  The successor to each such new member 
shall be appointed for a term of five (5) years.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1079 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
F.  Before assuming his duties on the Board, each member shall 
take and subscribe to the oath or affirmation provided in Article XV 
of the Oklahoma Constitution, which oath or affirmation shall be 
administered and filed as provided in said article. 
G.  A member may be re moved from the Board by the Governor for 
cause which shall include, but not be limited to: 
1.  Ceasing to be qualified; 
2.  Being found guilty by a court of competent jurisdiction of a 
felony or of any offense involving moral turpitude; 
3.  Being found guilty, through due process, of malfeasance, 
misfeasance or nonfeasance in relation to his Board duties; 
4.  Being found mentally incompetent by a court of competent 
jurisdiction; 
5.  Being found in violatio n of any provision of the Podiatric 
Medicine Practice Act; or 
6.  Failing to attend three consecutive meetings of the Board 
without just cause, as determined by the Board. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES 
April 5, 2021 - DO PASS