Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Coauthored by Bell | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 26 | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Strom |