House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Steagall
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Gann, Dobrinski, Patzkowsky, West (Tammy), Manger, Roberts (Sean), Lepak, Dills
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard, Allen
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Rick), Hardin (David), Boles, Conley, Smith, West (Kevin), Humphrey, Russ, Stark, CrosswhiteHader, McDugle, Grego, Wolfley, Kendrix, Mize, ODonnell, Lawson, Stearman
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Olsen
|
|
|