Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1104 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2021

Amended

Bill March 24, 2021
Bill February 19, 2021