Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1132 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2022

Amended

Bill April 4, 2022
Bill February 24, 2021