House
|
04/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 18
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 38; Ayes: 54 Nays: 38
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Osburn
|
|
|