Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Boles
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by West (Kevin)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert, Roberts (Dustin), Wallace, Bashore
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|