Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1497 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill March 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill March 1, 2021