House | 03/11/2021 | Returned to General Order | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 52 Nays: 37 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 51 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Olsen | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | Referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Gann | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |