House
|
05/11/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert, Boles, Cruz
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Blancett, Phillips, Walke, Talley, Davis, Munson, Ranson, Conley, Dobrinski, Waldron, Provenzano, Pae, Miller
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Rosecrants
|
|
|