Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1569 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2021

Amended

Bill March 24, 2021
Bill February 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 10, 2021