House
|
04/21/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Provenzano
|
|
|