Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1593 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill February 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2021