House
|
04/21/2021
|
Vetoed 04/21/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Withdrawn from Education committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak, Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Provenzano
|
|
|