House
|
05/02/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Remove Representative Fetgatter as principal House author and substitute with Representative Bashore
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Fetgatter
|
|
|