Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1611 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2022

Amended

Bill April 4, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022