House
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Steagall
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Mize
|
|
|