Senate | 04/11/2022 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 13 | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Ayes: 71 Nays: 14 | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Hardin (David) |