House
|
04/21/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 20
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Lepak
|
|
|