Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1647 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill March 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2021