Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1679 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2021

Amended

Bill April 5, 2021
Bill March 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2021