Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Remove as author Senator Stephens; authored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Olsen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Townley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin (David), Fugate, Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Grego
|
|
|