Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1681 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill February 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 7, 2021