Senate | 03/24/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Howard | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | Remove as author Senator Howard; authored by Senator Kidd | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Coauthored by Pittman | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 26 | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Grego |