House
|
04/21/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Newton
|
|
|